The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70591
Short Caption:RIGHETTI (JAVIER) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Related Case(s):73015
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276713Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/06/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/17/2016Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/17/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition Mandamus.16-19004
06/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.16-19019
09/16/2016MotionFiled Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.16-28809
09/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 20 days.16-29228
10/11/2016Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-31682
10/11/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-31683
10/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay. Petitioner has filed a motion to stay the proceedings in the underlying district court case pending resolution of the instant writ petition. The proceedings in the district court are currently stayed pursuant to NRS 174.098(2)(a). Having considered the motion, we deny it without prejudice to refile if a new trial date becomes imminent.16-32362
11/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Tuesday, December 6, 2016, @ 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas.16-34314
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-36215
12/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/26/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Second Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.17-02898
01/31/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Response to Second Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.17-03408
02/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We are not convinced that a stay is warranted at this point and therefore deny the motion.17-05508
02/16/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7. EN BANC17-05511
03/13/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-08285
03/13/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.