Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70592
Short Caption:N. LAKE TAHOE PROTECTION DIST. VS. BD. OF ADMIN.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A702463Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/23/2016 / England, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/07/2018 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/07/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/17/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger. Check no. 010435.
06/17/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-19057
06/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-19059
06/23/2016Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen J. England.16-19751
07/07/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-21169
07/11/2016Docketing StatementFiled First Amended Docketing Statement.16-21550
09/14/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 18, 2016 at 1 pm.16-28490
02/02/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Kathy J. England to file Final Status Report.17-03808
03/10/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-08199
03/14/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-08525
03/21/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-09390
06/07/2017MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request).17-18923
06/07/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 12, 2017.17-18928
06/14/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-19804
06/14/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.17-19805
06/14/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.17-19806
07/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief is not double-spaced. NRAP 32(a)(4)).17-23252
07/13/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-23372
08/10/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief - First Request (Answering Brief).17-26714
08/10/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: September 11, 2017.17-26718
09/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Rejected for non-compliance - Compliant Answering Brief due: 5 days.17-30648
09/13/2017BriefFiled Respondent The Board of Administration of the Subsequent Injury Account for the Associations of Self-Insured Public or Private Employers' Answering Brief.17-30813
09/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Division of Industrial Relations' Notice of Joinder in Respondent The Board of Administration of the Subsequent Injury Account for the Associations of Self-Insured Public or Private Employers Answering Brief.17-31008
10/11/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request).17-34585
12/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on November 21, 2017.17-41644
12/04/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-41648
12/04/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/13/2017MotionFiled Respondent Board's Motion to Strike.17-42964
12/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Division of Industrial Relations' Notice of Joinder in Respondent Board's Motion to Strike.17-43303
12/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We decline to strike page one of the reply brief.17-43974
03/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-11628
03/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-11801
04/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-15482
05/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Joint Appendix Volumes I and II.18-16427
05/07/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Division of Industrial Relations' Notice of Change of Address.18-20851
12/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. 'Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 93. EN BANC (SC)18-907298