Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70604
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/19/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/20/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-19219
08/16/2016OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
09/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.16-30199
10/26/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-16 (Via FTP).16-33565
11/02/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Formal Brief for the District Courts Denial of Civil Writ of Habeas Corpus. (TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 71374 PER ORDER FILED 1/27/17).
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 281-288 (SEALED).
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 301-309 (SEALED).
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1310-1313, 1860-1863, 1890-1891, 2009-2015, 2215-2216, 2266-2269, 2535-2538, 2745 (SEALED).
12/19/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
12/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.16-40394
01/27/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. On November 2, 2016 a pro se opening brief was filed in Docket No. 70604. Upon further review, it appears the pro se brief filed in Docket No. 70604 should have been filed in appellant's other appeal in Docket No. 71374. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall transfer the pro se opening brief filed on November 2, 2016, in Docket No. 70604 to the appeal in Docket No. 71374. Nos. 70604/71374.17-03010
02/23/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[The Honorable Jerome T. Tao, Judge, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-AS/MG
03/21/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
03/21/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-09301
03/21/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 28, 2017.17-09301