Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70626
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Senior Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/06/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/22/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-19501
06/22/2016OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
06/22/2016OtherJustice Nancy M. Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
08/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal16-26987
09/22/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-12 (Via FTP).16-29427
09/27/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1163-1166, 1527-1530, 1769-1774, 1784, 1805-1808, 2048-2053 (SEALED).
09/27/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1017-1022 (SEALED).
12/23/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.16-40092
02/06/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
02/08/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel.17-04568
02/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This is a pro se appeal from an order denying a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus, Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. Appellant is not entitled to appointed counsel at the state's expense in postconviction proceedings. Accordingly, we deny the motion.17-05410
02/16/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-05566
07/12/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG.
09/28/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/28/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's NRAP Rule 40B Petition for Review by the Supreme Court.17-33002
11/29/2017Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." NRAP 40B. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]17-40980
12/22/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur.17-44245
01/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until April 25, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by that date, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 25, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-00417
03/16/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed February 27, 2018 and placed on the docket as Case No. 17-8080.18-10421
03/20/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice to the Court and the Clerk.18-10915
05/17/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.18-18981
05/18/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-19055
05/18/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 22, 2018.18-19055