Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70679
Short Caption:HARRIS (LAMAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):59817, 70679-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C274370Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/30/2017How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/28/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-20272
07/14/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-21962
07/18/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/8/15.16-22303
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.16-25779
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.16-25780
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.16-25781
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4.16-25782
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5.16-25786
10/27/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief).16-33675
11/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: November 28, 2016.16-34653
11/29/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-36885
12/28/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-40306
01/30/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-03168
01/30/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
02/16/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-05575
11/16/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver/Tao. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons.
12/04/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
12/04/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review.17-41551
01/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.18-02568
02/05/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review.18-04745
05/03/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief, if warranted. The supplemental briefs shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, and 32. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]18-16928
05/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge, who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that nay party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure.18-17360
06/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Supplemental Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 15 days.18-24233
08/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 20 days.18-30819