The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70738
Short Caption:COMSTOCK RESIDENTS ASS'N VS. LYON CTY. BD. OF COMM'RSClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):68433
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - 14-CV-01304Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:11/07/2017 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luke Andrew Busby, Ltd. Check no. 6032.
07/07/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-21159
07/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-21162
07/08/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-21295
07/11/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-21502
07/21/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/14/16. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters.16-22687
07/29/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/14/16.16-23633
11/07/2016BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief.16-34549
11/07/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.16-34550
11/07/2016AppendixFiled Joint Alphabetical Index.16-34551
11/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney Luke A. Busby's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel.16-34972
12/06/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: December 21, 2016.16-37751
12/22/2016BriefFiled Respondent Lyon County Answering Brief.16-39940
01/19/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-02097
01/19/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/02/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John Marshall as counsel for the Appellants).17-07256
03/03/2017BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-07313
04/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-13614
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 7, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-32460
10/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-36261
10/30/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplementary Authority.17-36965
11/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/29/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. EN BANC18-12053
04/24/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-15653
04/24/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/04/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 25, 2018.18-15653