The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70795
Short Caption:STATE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GEN. VS. JUSTICE CT. (ESCALANTE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 16M-03289A-BCase Status:Disposition Filed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/27/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2016Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/14/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.16-22067
07/14/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.16-22068
07/26/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Sixty-Day Stay Pending Decision on Answer to Writ of Petition.16-23169
09/02/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Pending this Court's Decision to Direct an Answer to the Writ Petition.16-27413
09/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: 20 days. We stay proceedings below pending further order of this court.16-27984
09/26/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.16-29903
01/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-03007
04/06/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. NNP17-JH/RP/LS17-11410