Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70823
Short Caption:GARDNER VS. DIST. CT. (HENDERSON WATER PARK, LLC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71652, 73997, 77261
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A722259Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/12/2017 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/12/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Philip R. Erwin.
07/19/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-22472
07/19/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.16-22473
09/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.16-28827
10/13/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Writ Petition due: October 31, 2016.16-31905
11/01/2016Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-33985
11/07/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-34710
11/07/2016AppendixFiled Petitioners' Reply Appendix - Volume 1.16-34721
11/07/2016AppendixFiled Petitioners' Reply Appendix - Volume 2.16-34722
11/09/2016MotionFiled Petitioners'/Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeal with Pending Original Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing. Nos. 70823/71652.16-35002
11/22/2016MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitioners'/Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeal With Pending Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing.16-36345
11/29/2016MotionFiled Petitioners'/Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Appeal with Pending Original Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing.16-36877
12/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. We deny petitioners/appellants' opposed motion to consolidate these matters at this time. Although we declined to consolidate the tow cases, they will nevertheless be clustered. We reinstate the briefing schedule in Docket No. 71652 as follows. Transcript Request NRAP 9(a) due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 7, 2017. Nos. 70823/71652.16-38940
05/23/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-17274
07/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 12, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-23738
08/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-29151
09/12/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP17-MD/MG/KP.
11/22/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its order denying the Gardners' motions to amend their complaint and to allow the Gardners to amend their complaint. Before: Douglas/Gibbon/Pickering. Author: Gibbons J., Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 89. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-40346
11/22/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the opinion mailed to Attorney Philip Ervin for service upon Judge Jerry Wiese.17-40371
11/30/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Jerry A. Wiese on November 29, 2017.17-41244
12/18/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-43647
12/18/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.