Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 70857
Short Caption:MONA, JR. VS. FAR WEST INDUS.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68434, 73815
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A670352Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/25/2016 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/22/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marquis Aurbach Coffing. Check no. 118560.
07/22/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-22909
07/22/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-22913
07/25/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.16-23031
08/12/2016Docketing StatementFiled Joint Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-25007
08/16/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 21, 2016 at 9:30 am.16-25387
08/30/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Based upon what I know about this case to date, we scheduled the settlement conference for 9:30 in anticipation of all the principals/parties being present in person.16-27031
09/27/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued: Respondent will provide a written proposal for resolution by Oct. 12.16-30114
02/17/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-05799
02/22/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-06119
03/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended.17-09775
04/19/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Without Prejudice.17-12951
04/27/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. WE previously entered an order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We stated that this appeal may have been rendered moot by our resolution of a related writ petition in Docket No. 68434.The parties have now filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal wherein they agree that this appeal is moot. Accordingly, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued.17-13960