Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70868
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (GREGORY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294607Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/07/2018 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:02/07/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/26/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-23104
08/04/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/16/13, 12/27/13, 01/02/14, 01/22/14, 10/15/14, 10/27/14, 12/01/14, 12/03/14, 12/10/14, 02/04/15, 05/27/15, 10/07/15, 12/30/15, 02/17/15, 03/16/16, 03/18/16, 03/23/16, 03/28/16, 03/29/16, 03/30/16, 03/31/16, 04/01/16, 04/04/16, 05/23/16 and 06/13/16. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt, Jill Jacoby and Debbie Winn.16-24208
08/04/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-24232
09/12/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/16/13, 12/27/13, 01/02/14.16-28118
09/22/2016MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript.16-29424
09/26/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Recorder Jill Jacoby's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: October 13, 2016.16-29747
09/30/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/22/14, 10/15/14, 10/27/14, 12/01/14, 12/03/14, 12/10/14, 02/04/15, 05/27/15,10/07/15, 12/30/15, 02/17/16, 03/16/16, 03/23/16, 05/23/16, 06/13/16.16-30535
10/07/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/28/16, 03/29/16, 03/30/16, 03/31/16, 04/01/16, 04/04/16.16-31423
11/15/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.16-35467
11/15/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 23, 2016.16-35498
12/21/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief).16-39599
12/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief & Appendix due: February 21, 2017.16-40354
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I.17-06089
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II.17-06091
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III.17-06092
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV.17-06093
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V.17-06094
02/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI.17-06095
02/22/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-06107
03/24/2017MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).17-09940
03/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: April 24, 2017.17-09961
04/24/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Respondent's Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.17-13526
04/24/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report.17-13527
05/02/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall reject the answering brief received on April 24, 2017. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 15 days.17-14502
05/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 15 days.17-15234
05/17/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-16504
05/17/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
06/12/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief (Extension of Time).17-19267
06/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: July 17, 2017.17-19278
07/18/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-23792
07/18/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-42939
01/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.18-00705
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-02863
02/07/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/09/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix-Volume VII. (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX AND RECEIVED PER ORDER FILED 2/12/18)18-05507
02/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix. The clerk shall detach the proposed supplemental appendix from the motion filed on February 9, 2018, and receive it on this court's docket pending further order of this court.18-05622
10/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk is directed to file the supplemental appendix received by this court on February 12, 2018.18-42110
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. VII. (Supplemental Appendix)18-42111
10/25/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Author: Pickering/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83. EN BANC18-42112