Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70989
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF CHRISTOPHER READECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/25/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2016Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Bar Matter.
08/08/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I.16-24518
08/08/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II.16-24519
08/08/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II (cont...).16-24523
08/08/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II (cont...).16-24524
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument.16-24521
08/08/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter.
09/09/2016BriefFiled Opening Brief of R Chris Reade.16-28025
10/06/2016BriefFiled Answering Brief State Bar of Nevada's Answering Brief16-31194
10/25/2016BriefFiled Reply Brief of R Christopher Reade, Esq.16-33356
10/25/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/05/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel. (Attorney Jay Shafer representing appellant Christopher Reade.)17-29619
09/05/2017BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities.17-29623
11/16/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Suspension issued." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.]Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 87. EN BANC17-39493
11/16/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts.17-39572
11/21/2017Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. Bar Matter
11/21/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled R Christopher Reade's Petition for Rehearing.17-40209
11/21/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Compliance with Supreme Court Rule 115.17-40317
12/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.17-43852
01/03/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to petition for rehearing due: January 17, 2018.18-00206
01/17/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled State Bar's Response and Notice of Non-Opposition to Petition for Rehearing.18-02298
03/05/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.]18-08463
03/30/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-12263
03/30/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/12/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on April 3, 2018.18-12263