Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71006
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/17/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/10/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-24789
08/16/2016OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
09/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.16-30209
10/26/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-16 (Via FTP).16-33573
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 281-288 (SEALED).
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 301-309 (SEALED).
11/02/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1310-1313, 1860-1863, 1890-1891, 2009-2015, 2215-2216, 2266-2269, 2535-2538, 2745 (SEALED).
01/03/2017BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.17-00007
02/17/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
03/02/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-07129
04/19/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Jerome T. Tao, Judge, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] Court of Appeals-AS/MG
05/17/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
05/17/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-16473
05/17/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2017.17-16473