Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71045
Short Caption:HALL PRANGLE & SCHOONVELD, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (PETERSON) C/W 70083Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:70083*, 71045Related Case(s):67886, 70083
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A595780Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/21/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Dennis L Kennedy.
08/17/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief.16-25536
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 1-4.16-25542
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 5-7.16-25543
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 8-9.16-25544
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 10-11.16-25545
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12.16-25546
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 13-14.16-25547
08/17/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 15-17.16-25548
08/17/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Petitioners' NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.16-25642
08/18/2016MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 70083/71045.16-25742
09/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answers Writ Petition. Answers due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the last-filed answer to file and serve any reply.16-28866
09/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Consolidate. We grant appellants' and petitioners' motion and hereby consolidate these matters for purposes of disposition only. The matters shall be separately briefed according to the currently ordered briefing schedule. Nos. 70083/71045.16-29587
10/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Ketan Bhirud as counsel for the Respondent Hon. Richard Scotti (71045)). Nos. 70083/71045.16-30844
10/05/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent in Docket No. 71045 Answer to Writ Petition due: October 31, 2016. Nos. 70083/71045.16-30960
10/18/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ (71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-32530
10/18/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (70083). Nos. 70083/71045.16-32531
11/01/2016Petition/WritFiled Respondent Hon. Richard Scotti's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-34038
11/02/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File: (1) Appellants' Reply Brief; and (2) Petitioners' Reply Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.16-34250
11/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellants and petitioners shall have until December 15, 2016, to file and serve the replies. Nos. 70083/71045.16-34757
12/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent in Docket No. 70083 has filed a motion for clarification or to dismiss the estate of Jane Doe from the appeal on the ground that the estate does not have a position against appellants. Appellants have filed a response concurring that respondent does not have a reason to participate in the appeal. Having considered the motion and response, we clarify as follows. Respondent has filed its response to appellants' opening brief and shall remain a party to the appeal in Docket No. 70083. Nos. 70083/71045.16-37177
12/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (No. 71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-38999
04/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 70083/71045.17-13615
05/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, July 18, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-17183
06/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-21884
07/05/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument. Assistant Solicitor General appearing as counsel for The Honorable Richard Scotti, District Judge.17-22127
07/07/2017BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 70083/71045.17-22473
07/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. Dennis L. Kennedy of Bailey Kennedy will appear on behalf of Appellants Valley Health System, LLC.17-22586
07/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Robert Murdock to argue on behalf of the Real Party in Interest Misty Peterson). Nos. 70083/71045.17-22630
07/18/2017Case Status UpdateOral Argument held this day (not submitted). "Before the En Banc Court."
07/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. This order is directed solely to appellant in docket no. 70083. Appellant's supplemental brief due: 20 days. Nos. 70083/71045.17-23931
07/25/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.17-24727
08/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: September 7, 2017. Nos. 70083/71045.17-26190
09/07/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.17-30102
09/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 70083/71045.17-31936
09/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal affirmed in Docket No. 70083; petition denied in Docket No. 71045." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Pickering/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 76. EN BANC Nos. 70083/7104518-37761
10/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Correcting Opinion. The clerk of this court is directed to correct, in the advance opinion, the sentence beginning on page 20 and continuing through the second line on page 21 of this court's opinion to read as follows: The District Court Judge argues that the notice requirement was satisfied here because Hall Prangle knew that the district court would consider its conduct in its Young analysis and Doe accused Hall Prangle of violating RPC 3.3(a)(1) during litigation. Nos. 70083/71045.18-38282
10/16/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Universal Health Services, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 70083/71045.18-40523
10/16/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Dennis L. Kennedy. Nos. 70083/71045.
10/18/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Universal Health Services, Inc.'s Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 70083/71045.18-41000
11/09/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 70083/71045. (SC)18-903609