Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71089
Short Caption:SOLID (MICHAEL) VS. DIST. CT. (MY ENTERTAINMENT TV)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68106, 71809
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C290260Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/20/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2016Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/22/2016Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.16-26103
08/22/2016MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of District Court's Order Allowing Media Coverage by My Entertainment.16-26105
08/22/2016AppendixFiled Appendix in Support of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.16-26107
08/23/2016AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, In the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.16-26244
08/23/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of District Court's Order Allowing Media Coverage by My Entertainment.16-26258
08/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay and Directing Answer. Real Parties in Interest: Answer due: 5 days. Petitioner shall have 3 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.16-26321
08/30/2016Petition/WritFiled My Entertainment TV's Response to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition (Answer to Petition for Writ).16-26997
09/02/2016Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.16-27459
09/06/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by NACJ.16-27572
09/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae is granted. NACJ shall file a brief in compliance with NRAP 29(d) and (e) within 3 days from the date of this order. Any party wishing to respond to NACJ's amicus brief shall have 5 days from the date of its filing to file a response thereto.16-28058
09/12/2016BriefFiled Amicus Brief by Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ).16-28137
09/16/2016MotionFiled State's Response to Amicus Brief of NACJ.16-28931
09/16/2016AppendixFiled State's Appendix.16-28932
09/20/2016MotionFiled My Entertainment TV's Response to Amicus Brief Filed by Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice.16-29094
09/20/2016AppendixFiled My Entertainment TV's Appendix.16-29095
01/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.17-02264
04/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. EN BANC17-13951
05/22/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-17010
05/22/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.