The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0516
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT TO SCR 120 REGARDING COST AWARDSClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:09/14/2016Public Hearing:04/04/2017 at 2:30 PM (Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition.Y16-28493
02/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Filed Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing held on Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by March 28, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by March 28, 2017. (Exhibit A attached.)17-06774
04/04/2017Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.