Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71267
Short Caption:COTTER, JR. VS. DIST. CT. (COTTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72356
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A735305Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/03/2018 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/03/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Mark G. Krum.
09/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-28709
09/15/2016MotionFiled Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Writ Petition.16-28710
09/15/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-28711
09/15/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-28712
09/15/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.16-28713
09/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion for Stay. The district court's oral order granting motion to compel shall be stayed until further order from this court. Real parties in interest: Answer due 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.16-28722
10/14/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Margaret Cotter, Ellen Cotter, Douglas McEachern, Guy Adams, Edward Kane, Judy Codding, and Michael Wrotniak Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-32131
10/14/2016AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 1 to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-32132
10/14/2016AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 2 to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-32133
10/14/2016AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 3 to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-32134
10/17/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties' Reading International, Inc. Joinder to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-32246
11/01/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief (Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ).16-33943
11/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Real Party in Interest William Gould's Answer to Writ Petition due: 7 days. Petitioner shall have until December 1, 2016, to file and serve any reply.16-34075
11/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest William Gould's Joinder to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus.16-34923
12/02/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition.16-37333
12/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 4.16-37335
03/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Law Firm Only. Petitioner counsel, Mark Krum is now with Yurko, Salvesen & Remz, P.C./Washington, D.C.17-08042
03/23/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-09630
11/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 3, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Carson City.17-39791
11/22/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Steve Morris and Akke Levine as counsel for the Petitioner).17-40366
11/22/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
12/08/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on January 3, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. To accommodate this court's calendar, oral argument in this appeal will begin at 1:30 p.m. on January 3, 2018, in Carson City. Argument will be limited to 30 minutes.17-42367
12/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-43835
12/27/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Attorney Marshall M. Searcy of the law firm Quinn Emanuel Urquart & Sullivan, LLP appearing as counsel for real parties in interest Margaret Cotter, Ellen Cotter, Douglas McEachern, Guy Adams, Edward Kane, Judy Codding, and Michael Wrotniak.17-44629
01/03/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court.
01/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplement to Petitioner's Appendix.18-00550
01/08/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Second Supplement to Petitioner's Appendix.18-00823
05/03/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ instructing the district court to refrain from compelling disclosure of the emails until it reviews the emails in camera to evaluate whether they contain impressions, conclusions, opinions, and legal theories of counsel, as required pursuant to the work-product privilege. Fn1[ The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C. J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 32. EN BANC18-16774
05/03/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and two copies of the opinion mailed to Attorney Mark G. Krum for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.18-16876
05/25/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on May 22, 2018.18-20230
05/30/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-20419
05/30/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.