Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71268
Short Caption:RESOURCES GRP., LLC VS. NEVADA ASS'N SERV.'S, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A714027Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/10/2016 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/05/2018 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
09/16/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-28772
09/16/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-28775
09/30/2016Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn
10/05/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-31034
10/10/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle.16-31505
10/24/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-33233
11/18/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 15, 2016, at 1:30 pm.16-36141
11/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution Of Attorneys By Respondent Nevada Association Services, Inc. (Christopher Yergensen as counsel for the Respondent NAS).16-36467
03/27/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-10173
03/28/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-10387
04/07/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/07/16. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison.17-11633
06/26/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-21170
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-21172
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.17-21173
07/19/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondent Hydr-O-Dynamic Corporation to File Its Answering Brief.17-23972
07/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent Hydr-O-Dynamic Corporation's Answering Brief due: August 25, 2017.17-23978
08/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order To File Answering Brief. To date, NAS has failed to file the answering brief. Answering Brief due: 11 days.17-28023
08/25/2017BriefFiled Respondent Hydo-O-Dynamic Corporation's Answering Brief.17-28616
09/25/2017MotionFiled Stipulation Extending the Date to File Appellant's Reply Brief.17-32313
09/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. Appellant and respondent Hydr-O-Dynamic Corporation have filed a stipulation to extend the time to file appellant's reply brief. The reply brief is not yet due because respondent Nevada Association Services has not filed its answering brief. Accordingly, the stipulation is disapproved as unnecessary.17-32784
09/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 due: 15 days or Answering Brief or Motion due: 11 days.17-33193
10/04/2017MotionFiled Respondent Nevada Association Services, Inc.'s Motion to Waive its Right to File an Answering Brief.17-33749
10/11/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We vacate the conditional sanctions imposed on September 29, 2017. Reply Brief due: 30 days.17-34578
11/14/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-39062
11/14/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-07324
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 14, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-07736
03/07/2018MotionFiled Respondent Hydr-O-Dynamic Corporation's Motion to Postpone Oral Argument.18-09085
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for May 14, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the Northern Panel on the next available calendar.18-09253
05/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-16654
05/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-19618
06/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel.
01/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Assignment. The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, having previously participated in the above entitled matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter. (SC)19-04222
03/14/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Elissa F. Cadish and the Honorable Abbi Silver did not participate in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Douglas. Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Pickering, J., dissenting. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. EN BANC (SC)19-11364