Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71276
Short Caption:LABARBERA VS. WYNN LAS VEGAS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A695025Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/21/2016 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/21/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
09/19/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-28984
09/19/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-28986
09/19/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.16-28988
09/19/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey Albregts. Check No. 1115.
09/19/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-29043
09/21/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.16-29307
09/29/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-30332
10/03/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 14, 2016 at 10:00 am.16-30721
10/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Attorney's Updated Telephone Numbers (Jeffrey Albregts).16-31663
10/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court issued a notice directing appellant to file a case appeal statement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days.16-32084
10/17/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-32382
10/20/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.16-32921
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-36168
11/29/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/13/16-6/15/16. To Court Reporter: None listed.16-36923
12/30/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Judy Chappell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/13/16, 06/14/16, 06/15/16.16-40568
02/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. On October 20, 2016, we entered an order reinstating the briefing of this appeal and directing appellant to file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 18, 2017. To date, Appellant has failed to comply. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 20 days.17-04971
02/22/2017MotionFiled Appellant's (Unopposed) Motion To Continue Deadline For Opening Brief (Second Request).17-06173
02/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief & Appendix due: April 3, 2017.17-06803
04/03/2017BriefFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Opening Brief.17-10979
04/03/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol 1.17-11064
04/03/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol II.17-11065
04/03/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol III.17-11066
04/03/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol IV.17-11067
04/03/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol V.17-11069
04/04/2017AppendixFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Appendix, Vol VI.17-11076
04/18/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time For Respondent to File Answering Brief.17-12815
04/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 2, 2017.17-12824
04/25/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. The law firm of Lawrence J. Semenza, III. P.C. has changed its name to Semenza Kircher Rickard.17-13755
06/02/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Answering Brief (Second Request).17-18346
06/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 16, 2017.17-18701
06/16/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-20063
06/16/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume I.17-20064
06/16/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume II.17-20065
06/16/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume III.17-20066
06/16/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume IV.17-20067
07/17/2017MotionFiled Stipluation to Extend Time For Appellant to File Reply Brief.17-23677
07/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 21, 2017.17-24612
08/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant LaBarbera's Reply Brief.17-27986
08/21/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 1 (Pages 143 to 195).17-38895
01/03/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-00281
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 14, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-02764
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-07598
03/12/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion To Postpone Oral Argument.18-09586
03/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for Wednesday, March 14, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the Northern Panel on the next available argument calendar.18-09645
03/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-11105
05/22/2018OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/19/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. NNP18-MD/KP/JH18-27541
08/13/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-31078
08/13/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/24/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2018.18-31078