The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0519
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SCR 81 BOARD OF GOVERNORSClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:09/27/2016Public Hearing:06/08/2017 at 3:00 PM (Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition.16-30110
02/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing held on Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by March 28, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by March 28, 2017. (Exhibit A attached.)17-06773
03/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Alan Lefebvre with Kolesar & Leatham.17-08892
03/22/2017Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Ann Bersi.17-09508
03/22/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Postponing Public Hearing. This court previously scheduled this matter for a public hearing on April 4, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. The date and time of the rescheduled public hearing will be determined at a later date.17-09554
04/05/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing will be held on Tuesday, May 2, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by April 25, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by April 25, 2017. (Exhibit A attached.)17-11317
04/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Postponing Public Hearing. This court previously scheduled this matter for public hearing on May 2, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. This court has determined it appropriate to postpone the public hearing in this matter until June 8, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in Las Vegas.17-13278
04/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing will be held on Thursday, June 8, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by May 30, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by May 30, 2017. (Exhibit A attached.)17-13279
05/26/2017Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Francis C Flaherty with Dyer, Lawrence, Flaherty, Donaldson, Prunty.17-17776
06/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Dara J Goldsmith with Goldsmith & Guymon.17-18298
06/08/2017Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
06/09/2017Administrative CaseFiled Amended Petition.17-19160
09/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 81. Exhibit A is attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order. Hardesty, J., with whom Parraguirre, J., and Stiglich, J., agree, concurring.17-32977