The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71398
Short Caption:TRP INT'L, INC. VS. PROIMTU MMI LLCClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):68942, 69336, 70056, 70922
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV 36747Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
09/30/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-30558
09/30/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-30560
10/03/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-30676
10/03/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Pintar Albiston LLP. Check No. 1745.
10/07/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion under NRCP 27(e) for Clarification, or in the Alternative a Temporary Stay.16-31320
10/11/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Emergency Motion Under NRCP 27(e) and NRAP 8(a)(2) Requesting Clarification if the Matter is Stayed Pending Resolution of Appeal, or in the Alternative, a Temporary Stay.16-31538
10/11/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Declaration of Christopher H. Byrd, Esq. in Support of Response to Emergency Motion Under NRCP 27(e) and NRAP 8(a)(2) Requesting Clarification if the Matter is Stayed Pending Resolution of Appeal.16-31540
10/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause, Granting Motion for Clarification, and Denying Motion for Temporary Stay. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellant's response. Briefing is suspended.16-31771
11/14/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Establishing that the Supreme Court has Jurisdiction.16-35315
11/29/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Response to Order to Show Cause (Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause).16-36882
04/06/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Dismissed." Before" Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. NNP17-JH/RP/LS17-11411
05/01/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-14248
05/01/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/15/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 3, 2017.17-14248