Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71402
Short Caption:COOPER (KAMESHA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 13CR002111B002Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/06/2017 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/06/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/03/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-30649
10/17/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shellie Loomis stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/08/16.16-32278
10/19/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.16-32692
10/24/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.16-33173
10/24/2016MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Appellant's Request for Rough Draft Transcripts.16-33277
11/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the rough draft transcript request form received on October 24, 2016.16-33977
11/01/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 09/08/16. Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. Filed in district court on: 09/23/16.16-33979
11/10/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Attorney Kristin Luis appearing as counsel for respondent.16-35186
01/31/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief & Appendix due: February 14, 2017.17-03428
02/06/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-04164
02/06/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.17-04165
03/02/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: March 22, 2017.17-07257
03/23/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-09629
04/20/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-13145
04/20/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-24448
09/05/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Court Regarding Oral Argument.17-29727
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, November 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-32453
10/20/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (COUNSEL'S NAME FOR APPELLANT STRICKEN FROM PAGE 1 OF DOCUMENT PER ORDER 10/25/17).17-35951
10/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Clarification Regarding Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority and Motion to Strike.17-36033
10/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata to Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-36128
10/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-36254
10/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall strike appellant counsel's name and identifying information from page one of the joint notice of supplemental authority filed on October 20, 2017.17-36658
11/06/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/26/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. EN BANC18-28619
08/20/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-32254
08/20/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/24/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 21, 2018.18-32254