The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71414
Short Caption:US BANK, N.A. VS. SFR INV.'S POOL 1, LLCClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):63078
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A673671Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/02/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26000271.
10/04/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-30834
10/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-30838
10/04/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-30920
11/07/2016MotionFiled Motion For Extension To File Docketing Statement.16-34571
11/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and To File Documents. Docketing Statement due: 5 days. On October 4, 2016, this court issued a notice that this appeal is exempted from the settlement program. The notice informed appellant that the transcript request form must be filed by October 19, 2016. To date, appellant has failed to file the transcript request form. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.16-36940
11/30/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-37016
12/05/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on November 30, 2016, appellant filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 116.16-37542
12/06/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-37759
12/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.16-38132
12/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Respondent's Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-39568
01/10/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time (Response To Order To Show Cause).17-00685
02/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Response to Order to Show Cause due: February 8, 2017.17-03613
02/09/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Response To Order To Show Cause.17-04649
02/21/2017MotionFiled SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Response to U.S. Bank's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-05973
03/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days.17-08355
04/27/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.17-13961
04/27/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 30, 2017.17-13963
05/19/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief.17-16802
05/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 6, 2017.17-17386
06/06/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-18803
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume I.17-18805
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume II.17-18806
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume III.17-18807
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume IV.17-18808
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume V.17-18809
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume VI.17-18811
06/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume VII.17-18815
06/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (William Habdas as counsel for the Appellant).17-18898
07/06/2017MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Respondent?s Answering Brief.17-22270
07/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 7, 2017.17-22278
08/08/2017BriefFiled Respondent SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Answering Brief.17-26245
09/07/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension (Reply Brief).17-29955
09/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reply Brief due: October 6, 2017. Respondent Alessi & Koenig's Answering Brief due: 11 days.17-31560
10/04/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.17-33609
10/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Alessi & Koenig has failed to file an answering brief; accordingly, this appeal will be decided without an answering brief from it. Reply Brief due: November 6, 2017.17-36679
11/03/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.17-37671
11/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on November 13,2017.17-40079
11/20/2017BriefFiled Reply Brief.17-40082
11/20/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/28/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jamie Combs as counsel for the Appellant).17-40811
11/28/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Akerman LLP).17-40812
01/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-00005
03/15/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP18-MC/RP/LS18-10322
04/03/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.Y18-12599
04/03/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Ariel E. Stern