Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71435
Short Caption:JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS. 3416 BRAYTON MIST TR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687839Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/13/2016 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/25/2017How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
10/06/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-31103
10/06/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-31106
10/07/2016Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Kent F. Larsen
10/10/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice Pursuant to NRAP 44 (Constitutional Issue).16-31497
10/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-31871
10/13/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.16-32044
10/14/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on October 10, 2016, appellant filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS Chapter 116.16-32093
10/20/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-32895
10/21/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.16-33090
10/26/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.16-33537
12/15/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-38914
12/16/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that no Transcript is Being Requested.16-39128
01/20/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 7, 2017.17-02260
02/07/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-04435
02/07/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.17-04436
02/07/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2.17-04442
02/07/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3.17-04443
02/07/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4.17-04444
02/15/2017BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and in Support of Reversal of the Judgment of the District Court.17-05379
03/10/2017MotionFiled Stipulation Extending the Date to File Respondent's Reply Brief (Answering Brief).17-08127
03/10/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: April 10, 2017.17-08142
03/22/2017MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel - Asim Varma, Esq. of the law firm Arnold & Porter Kay Scholer, LLP.17-09464
04/11/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-11906
04/26/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Asim Varma of the law firm Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus in this matter. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart of Fennemore Craig, PC shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Varma in this appeal.17-13885
05/02/2017MotionFiled Stipulation Extending the Date to File Appellant's Reply Brief.17-14361
05/02/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: June 9, 2017.17-14426
06/02/2017MotionFiled Joint Motion to Stay Appeal.17-18462
06/07/2017MotionFiled Stipulation Extending the Date to File Appellant's Reply Brief.17-18913
07/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on June 9, 2017. The parties have also filed a motion to stay the briefing and this appeal. We deny the motion for stay.17-24702
07/25/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-24703
07/25/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/31/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-29254
09/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-32390
10/20/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 12/06/17).
10/30/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Untimely and Improper Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities.17-36953
12/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall strike the response filed on October 20, 2017.17-41981
03/23/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.18-11412
08/02/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC).19-32654
09/12/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn3 [The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment.] MG/LS/MD. (SC).19-38142