Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71451
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/10/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/10/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-31449
12/19/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Order to Set Briefing Schedule and Proper Notice.16-39297
04/21/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeal DISMISSED." fn1[In light of this order, we take no action on the pro se motions filed in Docket Nos. 71451, 71855 and 71856.] NNP17-JH/RP/LS Nos. 71451/ 71855/71856.17-13413
05/16/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-16283
05/16/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 19, 2017.17-16283