Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71472
Short Caption:PREVOST VS. STATE, DEP'T OF ADMIN.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A730918Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/24/2016 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
10/13/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-31909
10/13/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-31911
10/13/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.16-31915
10/13/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.16-31917
10/18/2016Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp
10/18/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.16-32463
10/18/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-32571
10/24/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe.16-33244
11/02/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-34159
11/02/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).16-34161
11/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement on SJ).16-34997
11/14/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for:16-35401
01/30/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1-27-17 at 2:30 pm.17-03265
02/01/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-03735
03/01/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-07076
03/15/2017Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.17-08637
05/30/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 13, 2017.17-17857
06/14/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-19658
06/14/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief.17-19660
07/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief is not double-spaced. NRAP 32(a)(4), Footnotes are not in the same size and typeface as the body of the brief. NRAP 32(a)(5)).17-23643
07/17/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.17-23646
07/17/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-23664
08/16/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: August 30, 2017.17-27346
08/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-27827
08/21/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-02578
05/31/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. Stiglich, J. with whom Hardesty, J., agrees, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. EN BANC18-20694
06/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-24093
06/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2018.18-24093