Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71516
Short Caption:BOWSER (TERRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):50851, 71516-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211162Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Cadish, SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/05/2018 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/18/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Filed by the District Court Clerk).16-32532
10/24/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. 16-33131
12/01/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Kirkpatrick stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/24/10, 3/14/11, 10/19/11, 7/2/12, 6/19/13, 3/19/14, 2/23/15, 5/11/15, 5/18/15, 5/19/15, 5/20/15, 5/21/15, 5/22/15, 05/23/15, 05/24/15, 05/25/15 5/26/15, 7/29/15, 8/19/15, 8/31/15, 9/9/15, 3/28/16.16-37198
02/08/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-04521
02/08/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-6.17-04526
03/10/2017MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief - First Request.17-08139
03/10/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: April 10, 2017.17-08147
04/10/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief).17-11722
04/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 1, 2017.17-12693
05/01/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-14271
05/09/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-15342
05/09/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/14/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opening Brief.17-19662
07/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed an unopposed motion for leave to file a supplemental opening brief. Supplemental Opening Brief that does not exceed 3828 words due: 15 days. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief that does not exceed 7486 due: 11 days from service of supplemental OB. Supplemental Reply consisting of no more than 4533 words due: 5 days from service of supplemental AB.17-22336
07/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief does not contain a table of contents)17-23952
07/19/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief Pursuant to Order Dated July 6, 2017.17-24021
07/26/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief.17-24903
07/28/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief.17-25137
08/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-29066
12/15/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Silver, C.J. concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
12/22/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
12/22/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Review by the Nevada Supreme Court.17-44201
02/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.18-07107
03/09/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review.18-09462
03/21/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review and Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 30 days. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of Supplemental OB. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: 15 days from service of Supplemental AB. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]18-10968
03/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure.18-11117
04/19/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief Pursuant to Order Dated March 21, 2018.18-15183
05/22/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief.18-19401
06/01/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief Per Order Dated March 21, 2018.18-20836
09/24/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-37233
09/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, November 5, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-37409
10/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-41510
11/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
01/07/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
05/16/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Elissa F. Cadish and the Honorable Abbi Silver, Justices, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre. Stiglich, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. EN BANC (SC)19-21558
06/10/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-24953
06/10/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)