Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71548
Short Caption:RAWSON VS. DIST. CT. (CAIN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69333, 69889, 70864, 76381
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 11-CV-0296Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Peter Dubowsky.
10/21/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition.16-33038
10/21/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.16-33046
11/02/2016OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this petition should not be summarily denied. Real Parties in Interest, on behalf of Respondents, shall have15 days from service of the respondent to file and serve any reply.16-36377
12/13/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Brief Re: Order To Show Cause.16-38652
12/13/2016AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix (Response to Order to Show Cause).16-38653
12/23/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply to Response to OSC due: January 11, 2017.16-39977
01/11/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause (Real Parties-in-Interest's Answering Brief).17-01022
01/11/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix to Answering Brief (Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause).17-01026
01/11/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix to Answering Brief (Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause).17-01027
06/29/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. SNP16P-KP/JH/RP17-21689
07/24/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-24390
07/24/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.