The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0521
Short Caption:IN RE: PROPOSED AMENDMENTS TO NRCP 16.1Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:10/27/2016Public Hearing:02/09/2017 at 1:30 PM (Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:05/22/2017

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition.Y16-33746
12/28/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Thursday, February 9, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. at the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Video-conferenced to Supreme Court in Las Vegas. Written comment invited. Original and 8 copies due by February 2, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by February 2, 2017. (Exhibit attached.)16-40356
02/09/2017Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
02/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Repealing NRCP 16.1 (Domestic Relations Case) and Amending NRCP 16.2 and NRCP 16.205. Exhibit A, B and C attached. Effective May 1, 2017.17-06767
05/22/2017Administrative CaseCase Closed.