Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71638
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
11/04/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus.16-34452
11/04/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges.
11/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-34458
11/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-34459
11/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.16-34461
11/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.16-34462
11/04/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Volumes V-VII of its Appendix Under Seal and to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus.16-34463
11/15/2016OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed an unopposed motion for leave to file volumes V-VII of its appendix under seal and redact portions of its petition that cite to those portions of the appendix. We deny the motion without prejudice. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order to renew the motion, if deemed warranted. The submitted unredacted petition and volumes V-VII of the appendix will remain confidential pending receipt of the renewed motion.16-36719
12/02/2016MotionFiled Motion To Extend The District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(E) Emergency Motion For Interim Extension Of Stay.16-37430
12/06/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party In Interest's Notice of Intent to File Opposition to Wynn Resorts' Motion to Extend the District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.16-37710
12/06/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Real Parties in Interest (Steve Morris as counsel for the Real Parties in Interest).16-37761
12/08/2016MotionFiled Aruze Parties' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(E) Emergency Motoin for Interim Extension of Stay.16-37954
12/14/2016MotionFiled Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Renewed Motion to File Volumes V-VII of its Appendix Under Seal and to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus.16-38676
12/16/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support Of Motion To Extend The District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition And Rule 27(E) Emergency Motion For Interim Extension Of Stay.16-39121
12/20/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition For Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. Having considered the petition and supporting documents, we are not persuaded that our extraordinary and discretionary intervention is warranted at this time. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn 2[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] fn3[In light of our disposition of this writ petition, petitioner's motion for a stay is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion to file volumes V-VII of its appendix under seal and redact portions of its writ petition is granted. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to file the sealed appendices and writ petition that were provisionally received in this court on November 8, 2016, and to place an unredacted version of the writ petition in this court's nonpublic file.]16-39523
12/20/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
12/20/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus Volumes 5-7 (SEALED).
01/19/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-02220
01/19/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.