Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71652
Short Caption:GARDNER VS. HENDERSON WATER PARK, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70823, 73997, 77261
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A722259Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/23/2016 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/07/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Campbell & Williams. Check no. 22791.
11/07/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-34711
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-34713
11/07/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-34778
11/09/2016MotionFiled Petitioners'/Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeal with Pending Original Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing. Nos. 70823/71652.16-35003
11/10/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.16-35110
11/18/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.16-36143
11/22/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Petitioners'/Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeal With Pending Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing.16-36337
11/23/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge, this appeal is removed from the settlement program. Briefing and the requesting of transcripts shall remain suspended, however, pending resolution of the pending motion to consolidate this appeal with the writ petition in Docket No. 70823.16-36561
11/29/2016MotionFiled Petitioners'/Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Appeal with Pending Original Writ Proceeding and to Revise Briefing.16-36878
12/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Filed Order Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. We deny petitioners/appellants' opposed motion to consolidate these matters at this time. Although we declined to consolidate the tow cases, they will nevertheless be clustered. We reinstate the briefing schedule in Docket No. 71652 as follows. Transcript Request NRAP 9(a) due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 7, 2017. Nos. 70823/7165216-38945
12/16/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/13/16. To Court Reporter: Amber Riggio.16-39220
12/22/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.16-39937
12/22/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.16-39938
01/19/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: February 6, 2017.17-02191
02/06/2017BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.17-04246
02/09/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.17-04662
02/09/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.17-04672
02/09/2017BriefFiled Amended Appellants' Reply Brief.17-04683
02/09/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-21217
08/03/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-25808
08/28/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-28731
08/28/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/08/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2017.17-28731