Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71681
Short Caption:PAWLIK VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A698868Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/02/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/09/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
11/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-35072
11/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-35074
11/17/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Noggle Law, PLLC. Check No. 7078.
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-36192
11/21/2016Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-36295
12/01/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/12/16. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.16-37234
12/07/2016Transcript RequestFiled Amended Transcript Request. Transcripts requested: 1/12/16. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd (Initial request listed wrong court reporter).16-37808
12/07/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service for Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings.16-37872
12/13/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-38443
02/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended.17-06275
03/24/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-09883
04/26/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause.17-13832
05/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellant's response.17-14880
06/02/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-18412
06/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.17-20787
08/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-27829
08/21/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-27835
08/21/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.17-27837
09/21/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion To Extend Time (Answering Brief).17-31940
09/21/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 20, 2017.17-31958
10/23/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-36111
11/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-40308
11/21/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/22/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Akerman LLP)17-40458
01/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-00004
05/18/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Ariel Stern as counsel for the Respondent).18-19155
12/11/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH. (SC).18-908115
01/07/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-00829
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/24/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2019. (SC)19-00829