Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71727
Short Caption:EPPS (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71727-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C285595Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/16/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/16/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-35702
12/02/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/27/12, 11/29/12 (Schmidt), 12/13/12, 12/12/13, 02/28/13, 04/16/13, 06/24/14, 09/02/14, 10/27/15, 04/14/16, 05/19/16, 07/19/16, 07/26/16, 07/28/16 (Ramsey), 08/20/15, 03/03/16, 03/17/16 (Slattery), 07/14/16 (Georgilas), 08/01/16, 08/02/16, 08/03/16, 08/04/16, 08/05/16, 08/09/16, 08/10/16 (Richardson), 10/06/16 (Winn). To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt, Sara Richardson, Michelle Ramsey, Cynthia Georgilas.16-37308
12/07/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-37773
12/23/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/14/16.16-40042
12/30/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cynthia Georgilas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/13/12, 02/12/13, 02/28/13, 04/16/13, 06/24/14, 08/20/15, 09/02/14, 10/27/15, 03/03/16, 03/17/16, 04/14/16, 05/19/16, 07/14/16, 07/19/16, 07/26/16, 07/28/16.16-40560
01/11/2017MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript.17-01087
01/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Ms. Richardson's Court Reporter Certificate due: February 21, 2017.17-02296
03/02/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/06/16, 08/01/16, 08/02/16, 08/03/16, 08/04/16, 08/05/16, 08/09/16, 08/10/16.17-07137
03/17/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Opening Brief.17-08945
03/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief & Appendix due: June 14, 2017.17-09776
06/13/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Opening Brief (Second Request).17-19420
06/26/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on June 20, 2017. Answering Brief due: 30 days.17-21128
06/26/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-21129
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1.17-21130
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2.17-21131
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3.17-21132
06/26/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4.17-21133
07/26/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).17-24799
07/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 25, 2017.17-24805
08/16/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-27505
09/15/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-31271
09/15/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-34822
03/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
06/06/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
06/06/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition For Supreme Court Review.18-21466
07/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.18-28626
08/09/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review.18-30678
09/21/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the service of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief, if warranted. The supplemental briefs shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, and 32. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]18-37100
09/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure.18-37119
10/22/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief.18-41507
10/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix.18-41551
11/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC)18-904694
12/04/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief. (SC)18-906902
12/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Appendix. (SC)18-906908
12/04/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/07/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
04/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-17370