Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71789
Short Caption:O'CONNELL VS. WYNN LAS VEGAS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70583, 70583-COA, 71789-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A655992Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SilverCase Status:No Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Brian D. Nettles, Inc. Check no. 18983.
11/30/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-37018
11/30/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-37020
12/01/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief.16-37212
12/14/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-38788
12/16/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-39123
01/17/2017MotionFiled Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeal With Appeal Number 70583. Nos. 70583/71789.17-01511
01/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Regarding Briefing. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until March 31, 2017, to file and serve an opening brief. Appellant in Docket No. 71789 shall then have 30 days to file a combined answering brief and opening brief in regard to the appeal in Docket No. 71789. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 28.1(f)(1). Nos. 70583/71789.17-02536
03/16/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-08800
04/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until May 1, 2017, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 70583/71789.17-11812
04/25/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. The law firm of Lawrence J. Semenza, III. P.C. has changed its name to Semenza Kircher Rickard. Nos. 70583/71789.17-13732
05/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14289
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14291
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14292
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14293
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14294
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14295
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14296
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14297
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14298
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14299
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14300
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14301
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14302
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14303
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14304
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14305
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14306
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 17. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14307
05/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 18. Nos. 70583/71789.17-14308
05/26/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-17750
05/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief due: June 30, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789.17-17756
06/28/2017MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-21481
07/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received via E-Flex on July 21, 2017; and the combined answering and opening brief received via E-Flex on July 23, 2017. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined reply and answering brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-25352
07/31/2017AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. Nos. 70583/71789.17-25357
07/31/2017AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. Nos. 70583/71789.17-25358
07/31/2017AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. Nos. 70583/71789.17-25359
07/31/2017BriefFiled Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-25361
08/28/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC to File Combined Reply and Answering Brief - First Request.17-28698
08/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: September 29, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789.17-28700
09/26/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline to File Its Combined Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-32623
10/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the combined brief received on October 13, 2017. Yvonne O'Connell shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief in Docket No. 71789, if deemed necessary. Nos. 70583/71789.17-35348
10/16/2017BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal.17-35358
11/06/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789.17-38004
11/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 18, 2017.17-38013
12/14/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 70583/71789.17-43168
12/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's (Yvonne O'Connell in docket no. 71789) Reply Brief due: January 8, 2018. Nos. 70583/71789.17-43814
01/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-00480
01/04/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789.18-00490
01/04/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789.18-00492
01/04/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789.18-00493
01/04/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789.18-00494
01/04/2018BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant O'Connell's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789.18-00525
01/04/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 70583/71789.
01/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. Nos. 70583/7178918-02505
05/22/2018OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789
08/30/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 70583 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition. Judgment was affirmed in Docket No. 70583.] Before: Silver/Tao/Gobbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver/Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons.
09/14/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/14/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant/Respondent's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. Nos. 70583/71789.18-36089
11/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Answer to Petition for Review due: 15 days. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC)18-906002
12/13/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Response to Petition for Review. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC)18-908493
01/07/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789 (SC)
01/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Petition for Review in Docket No. 70583. fn1[Because neither party has sought our review in Docket No. 71789, we deconsolidate the appeals for all further appellate purposes. fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself.] EN BANC Nos. 70583/71789. (SC)19-03915
01/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge, who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC)19-03970
04/04/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-14640
04/04/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
04/23/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 9, 2019. (SC)19-14640