Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71826
Short Caption:HUNTER (EVERETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71826-COA, 78207
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR151841Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/07/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-37792
12/19/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Thank You for Your Service."16-39299
01/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Due: 30 days.17-00279
01/10/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Shane Chesney as counsel for Respondent).17-00846
01/17/2017Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "In Regards to Prison Appeal Log."17-01654
01/18/2017MotionFiled Response to Court Order (Notice of Appeal Log).17-01747
02/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Limited Remand For Designation of Counsel. This court's preliminary review revealed a potential jurisdiction defect-the notice of appeal was untimely filed. Thus, this court directed the attorney general to file a response and provide copies of any logs utilized to establish the date the notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials. Having considered the State's response and the documents before this court, this court concludes that this appeal may proceed. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District Court Written or Minute Order or Notice of Appearance due: 35 day.17-03949
02/06/2017Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Rogue Prosecution."17-04160
02/13/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed in district court on 2/8/17. (In Response to Supreme Court Order 2/3/17).17-04934
02/21/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/08/17. Order.17-06055
04/03/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter in Regards to the Appointment of Counsel.17-10927
04/26/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Writ of Mandamus/or in Alternative to Motion to Sanction District Court for Non-Compliance [Emergency] [Injunction Relief Requested].17-13883
05/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Designation of Counsel. To date, no order appointing counsel or notice of appearance has been filed in this case. Accordingly, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel, or inform this court of the status of this case. fn1[In light of this order, we take no action on the pro se documents filed on April 3, 2017, and April 26, 2017.]17-17372
05/30/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/30/17. Referring case to Robert Bell for appointment of counsel.17-17968
06/08/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 06/08/17 appointing Troy Jordan as counsel for appellant.17-19025
06/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.17-20006
07/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-22433
07/06/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/15/16, 8/16/16 and 10/20/16. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services.17-22434
08/09/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/16/16.17-26634
08/09/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/15/16.17-26695
08/17/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/20/16.17-27649
08/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Shane Chesney Withdraws his Appearance as Counsel for Respondent in this matter).17-28913
10/30/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-37026
10/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.17-37027
10/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.17-37029
11/29/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-41137
11/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 29, 2017.17-41141
12/27/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-44627
01/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 12, 2018.18-00422
01/12/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-01910
01/12/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.18-01911
02/12/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 26, 2018.18-05644
02/27/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-07530
02/27/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/05/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.18-12953
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG.
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/11/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-35366
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/21/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 12, 2018.18-35366