Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71856
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-38139
01/06/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Court to Issue Briefing Schedule and/or to Take Judicial Action to Issue Briefing Schedule.17-00477
02/13/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Clarification by the Court in Order to Identify the Causes as to Each Appeal Issue, Case No. 71855, 71856, 71857 and Objection to this Court Order February 3, 2017 Denying Appellant's Motion as Moot.17-04976
04/21/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeal DISMISSED." fn1[In light of this order, we take no action on the pro se motions filed in Docket Nos. 71451, 71855 and 71856.] NNP17-JH/RP/LS Nos. 71451/ 71855/71856.17-13417
05/16/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-16297
05/16/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 19, 2017.17-16297