Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71857
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/01/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-38141
01/06/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Court to Issue a Briefing Schedule, and/or to Take Judicial Action to Issue a Briefing Schedule.17-00479
01/24/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 01/12/17. Finding of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 01/24/2017 - C246300-2).17-02673
02/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. fn1[The motion filed on January 6, 2017, is denied as moot.]17-03932
02/13/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Clarification by the Court in Order to Identify the Causes as to Each Appeal Issue, Case No. 71855, 71856, 71857 and Objection to this Court Order February 3, 2017 Denying Appellant's Motion as Moot.17-04978
02/23/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-25 (via FTP).17-06259
02/28/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1400-1407 (SEALED).
02/28/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 3709 and 3713-3716 (SEALED).
04/13/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Copy Limit Increase to Copy Excerpts of Record, Jury Instructions, Exhibits, Ect. to Support Appellate Arguments Relating to Habeas Appeal, and Motion to Allow Additional Pages to Expand Upon the Arguments Raised on Appeal Due to the Complexity of Issues and Motion for Appointment of Counsel to Conduct Investigation, Discovery and Address Issues at an Evidentiary Hearing.17-12221
04/13/2017BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.17-12223
04/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to extend his prison copywork limit. Having considered the motion, we deny it. However, we waive any requirements that appellant attach copies of documents to his opening brief or informal brief. Appellant's request for leave to file an informal brief with an additional 20 pages is denied as moot. Appellant's opening brief was filed on April 13, 2017. Finally, appellant requests the appointment of appellate counsel. Appellant is not entitled to appointed counsel at the state's expense in postconviction proceedings.17-12881
05/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for clarification to identify the issue relating to each appeal number and an objection to this court's order denying appellant's motion for a briefing schedule. Docket No. 71855 was an appeal from an order denying a motion to disqualify a judge and was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction on April 21, 2017. Docket No. 71856 was an appeal from an order denying a motion to strike false information from presentence investigation report and a motion for a parole rehearing. This appeal was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction on April 21, 2017. Docket No. 71857 is an appeal from an order denying a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Appellant filed his opening brief on April 13, 2017; we decline to revisit our order denying the motion for a briefing schedule.17-15545
06/01/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
06/16/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-20039
11/15/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[On August 3, 2017, and October 26, 2017, Rimer filed motions for the appointment of counsel. We deny these motions. We have reviewed all documents Rimer has filed in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
11/30/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petition for rehearing due: December 18, 2017. (Filed in error in Supreme Court. Order will be file din Court of Appeals.)
05/07/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
05/07/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: May 22, 2018.18-17196
05/22/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Petition Under Rule 40B.18-19408
05/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the petition for review received on May 22, 2018.18-20522
05/30/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Rule 40B Petition for Review By the Nevada Supreme Court.18-20524
07/26/2018Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. "Review Denied." NRAP 40B. fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]18-28609
08/09/2018MotionFiled Proper Person "Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Certiorari with the U.S. Supreme Court, with Accomaning Affidavit Supporting Impeachment Proceedings."18-30714
08/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until December 18, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by December 18, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by December 18, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-31729
12/14/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document - "Memorandum of Certiorari Filed, with Motion For Order to Cause Clerk to Provide Appellant with His File Stamped Copies of Affirmation Order, State Habeas, and Habeas Appeal, Direct Appeal Affirmation Necessary to Supplement."18-908862
12/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter Regarding Proper Person Appellant's Document Filed on December 14, 2018. (SC)18-910040
01/11/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-01723
01/11/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/24/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 15, 2019. (SC)19-01723