Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 71873
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO S.L., N.R.B., H.R.B., W.C.B. C/W 71889Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:71873*, 71889Related Case(s):71889
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D510944Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/11/2018 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/11/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Turco & Draskovich, LLP. Check no. 4529.
12/13/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule issued to all counsel.)16-38659
12/14/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
12/22/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/23/16, 05/24/16, 05/27/16, 08/15/16, 08/18/16, 08/19/16, 08/22/16, 08/25/16, 08/26/16, 08/29/16, 09/01/16, 09/08/16, 09/15/16, 09/23/16. To Court Reporter: Judge Cynthia Giuliani's Chambers.16-39861
01/04/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-00132
02/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. Appellants' Opening Briefs and Appendices due: March 28, 2017. fn1[Appellants are encourage to file a single appendix containing all documents necessary for both appeals.]17-05014
02/13/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-05115
02/28/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of the Briefing Schedule (Opening Brief). Nos. 71873/71889.17-06901
03/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Briefs and Joint Appendix due: May 30, 2017. Nos. 71873/71889.17-07613
03/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts. Appellants' counsel have filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs in which counsel inform this court that the transcripts requested in Docket No. 71873 have not yet been received. To date, Transcript Video Services has not filed the notice of delivery required by NRAP 9(c)(2). Court Reporter Certificate due: 14 days. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.] fn2[If Transcript Video Services believes it is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, it shall inform this court in writing within 7 days of the date of this order.] Nos. 71873/71889.17-09018
03/22/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachel Chaisson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/23/16, 05/24/16, 05/27/16, 08/18/16, 08/19/16, 08/22/16, 08/25/16, 08/26/16, 09/01/16, 09/08/16, 09/15/16, 09/23/16. Nos. 71873/71889.17-09510
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume I. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18030
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume II. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18031
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume III. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18032
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume IV. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18033
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume V. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18034
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume VI. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18035
05/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief Volume VII. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18036
05/31/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Disclosure statement is required. NRAP 26.1). Nos. 71873/71889.17-18045
05/31/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Joint Opening Brief. Nos. 71873/71889.17-18067
06/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellants' Joint Opening Brief. Nos. 71873/71889.17-19100
06/15/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's S.L.'s Answering Brief due: July 5, 2017. Nos. 71873/71889.17-19813
06/16/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services' Answering Brief due: July 5, 2017. Nos. 71873/71889.17-20122
07/06/2017BriefFiled Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services' Answering Brief. Nos. 71873/71887.17-22408
07/06/2017AppendixFiled Respondent State of Nevada Department of Family Services' Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 71873/71889.17-22392
07/06/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent S.L.'s NRAP 26.1 Disclosure and Joinder to Answering Brief. Nos. 71873/71889.17-22455
08/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Counsel's Amended Certificate of Service of Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. Respondents' (S.L., N.R.B., H.R.B., & W.C.B.) Answering Briefs due: 30 days from the amended service. Nos. 71873/71889.17-26309
08/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service (Opening Brief and Appendix).17-26444
10/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. Respondents N.R.B., H.R.B., and W.C.B. Answering Brief due: 11 days. Nos. 71873/71889.17-35329
10/18/2017BriefFiled Respondents' N.R.B., H.R.B. and W.C.B.'S Answering Brief and Joinder to Appellant's Petition For Review. Nos. 71873/71889.17-35606
11/01/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: November 16, 2017. Nos. 71873/71889.17-37379
11/16/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Joint Reply Brief. Nos. 71873/71889.17-39647
11/16/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/22/2017BriefFiled Respondents N.R.B., H.R.B. and W.C.B.?S Answering Brief and Joinder to Appellants? Petition for Review. Nos. 71873/7188917-40484
02/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 71873/71889.18-07418
02/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, April 11, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-07811
03/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-11961
04/11/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel.
08/02/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 59. SNP18-MC/RP/LS Nos. 71873/7188918-29636
08/27/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 71873/7188918-33372
08/27/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 71873/71889
09/07/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2018.18-33372