Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71875
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS DEV. GRP., LLC VS. BLAHACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A715532Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/12/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd. Check no. 21514.
12/12/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-38396
12/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.16-38398
12/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-38400
12/13/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.16-38434
12/13/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.16-38528
12/14/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-38685
12/14/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-38741
12/15/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/13/16, 11/15/16. To Court Reporter: Kristy Clark.16-38855
01/26/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/15/16.17-02884
04/13/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request).17-12226
04/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 15, 2017.17-12228
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-16011
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.17-16012
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.17-16013
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.17-16014
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.17-16024
05/15/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6.17-16016
05/16/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-16294
06/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (William Habdas as counsel for Respondents Bank of America and Recontrust Company).17-19146
06/09/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Respondent Bank of America, N.A. and Recontrust's Answering Brief.17-19161
06/09/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents Bank of America N.A and Recontrust Company N.A.'s Answering Brief due: July 17, 2017.17-19166
06/15/2017BriefFiled Respondent James R. Blaha and Noble Home Loans, Inc.'s (Formerly Known as FCH Funding, Inc.) Answering Brief.17-19819
06/23/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Request).17-21009
07/18/2017BriefFiled Respondent Bank of America, N.A. and Recontrust Company, N.A.'s Joining Answering Brief17-23802
07/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the reply brief is approved. Reply Brief due: August 16, 2017.17-24696
08/15/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-27177
08/15/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Akerman LLP).17-40053
01/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-02580
05/03/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. EN BANC18-16777
05/30/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-20475
05/30/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/13/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2018.18-20475