Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71919
Short Caption:DESAGE VS. AW FIN. GRP., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A645456Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/20/2016 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/24/2019 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/24/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/15/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jared Kahn. Check no. 1013.
12/15/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-39011
12/15/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-39013
12/20/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.16-39526
01/05/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-00296
01/05/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service for Docketing Statement Civil Appeal.17-00363
01/19/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/2/17 at 10:00 am.17-02133
01/19/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Errata to Docketing Statement.17-02207
03/28/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-10382
04/04/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-11209
04/12/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-12040
06/30/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief (First Request).17-21926
07/31/2017MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.17-25315
08/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 1, 2017.17-26620
08/31/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-29288
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1.17-29289
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2.17-29290
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3.17-29291
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4.17-29292
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5.17-29293
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6.17-29294
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7.17-29295
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8.17-29296
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9.17-29297
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10.17-29298
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11.17-29307
08/31/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12.17-29308
09/22/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: October 16, 2017.17-32086
10/10/2017MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Second Request).17-34333
10/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 30, 2017.17-36181
10/30/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 13. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 3/29/18).17-37160
10/30/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-37181
11/29/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief.17-41192
11/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: December 29, 2017.17-41194
12/29/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief.17-45036
12/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Motion to Extend Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief.17-45038
01/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 29, 2018.18-01535
01/29/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.18-03996
01/30/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.18-04103
01/30/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/06/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondent to File Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.18-04955
02/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall file the opposition to motion to strike received on February 14, 2018. Appellants shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply.18-06740
02/21/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Strike Supplemental Appendix.18-06742
02/28/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.18-07839
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike in Part and Regarding Amended Briefs. The clerk shall strike the supplemental appendix filed on October 30, 2017. Respondent shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended answering brief that does not contain any citations to the supplemental appendix. Appellant shall have 11 days from service of the amended answering brief to file and serve an amended reply brief. Should respondent fail to file an amended answering brief, this appeal will be decided based on the answering brief currently on file. In the event respondent fails to file an amended answering brief, appellant may file an amended reply brief within 20 days of the date of this order.18-12123
04/09/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief (A.W. Financial Group, LLC).18-13438
04/23/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellants' Amended Reply Brief (First Request).18-15372
04/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Amended Reply Brief due: May 11, 2018.18-16347
05/11/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation for Appellants' Amended Reply Brief.18-18168
05/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall reject the amended reply brief received on May 11, 2018. Reply Brief that complies with the page or type-volume limitation of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) due: 20 days.18-20214
06/15/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Amended Reply Brief.18-23006
10/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefs. Appellants' brief is due 15 days from the date of this order, with respondent's brief to follow 15 days from the service of appellants' brief.18-42241
11/14/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: November 28, 2018. (SC)18-903993
11/28/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Supplemental Brief. (SC)18-906013
12/13/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (SC)18-908518
02/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, March 14, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-05200
02/08/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument Due to Scheduling Conflict. (SC)19-06098
02/14/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Tom Lallas for Respondent). (SC)19-07058
02/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-07492
02/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Oral Argument is hereby rescheduled on April 24, 2019, at the hour of 11:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)19-07648
04/10/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-15522
04/24/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC (SC)