Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 72057
Short Caption:LIPSITZ (RYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C316678Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/28/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/05/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-00340
01/13/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/21/16, 08/02/16, 09/01/16, 09/06/16, 09/08/16, 09/09/16, 09/12/16, 09/13/16, 09/14/16, 09/15/16, 09/16/16, 09/19/16, 11/08/16, 11/29/16. To Court Reporter: Cynthia Georgilas and Angie Calvillo.17-01464
01/17/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.
01/17/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-01570
01/24/2017MotionFiled Court Recorder's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts.17-02632
01/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Recorder Angie L. Calvillo's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: March 31, 2017. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 23, 2017.17-03282
02/02/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer Gerold stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/21/16.17-03879
02/24/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/02/16, 09/01/16, 09/06/16, 09/08/16, 09/09/16, 11/08/16, 11/29/16.17-06497
03/29/2017MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts.17-10516
04/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Angie Calvillo has filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the trial transcripts requested in this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Ms. Calvillo's Court Recorder Certificate due: May 1, 2017.Given the extension of time, we also extend the time for appellant to file the opening brief. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 30, 2017.17-11137
05/22/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/12/16, 09/13/16, 09/14/16, 09/15/16, 09/16/16, 09/19/16.17-16975
06/27/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Substitution of Attorney and Amy A Feliciano, Esq.'s Notice of Appearance As Counsel for Appellant Lipsitz.17-21356
06/27/2017MotionFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Motion for Extention of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief Due to Substitution of Counsel.17-21357
07/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.17-22250
09/06/2017MotionFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Motion for One-Week Extention of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-29796
09/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 15, 2017.17-30565
10/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Opening Brief. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days.17-34276
10/24/2017MotionFiled Appellant's ExParte Emergency Motion to File Under Seal.17-36605
11/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to File Under Seal. Appellant's attorney has filed an ex parte motion to file a motion for explanation under seal. The motion to seal is denied. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days.17-38402
11/21/2017MotionFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.17-40133
11/28/2017MotionFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Supplemental Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.17-40925
12/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed motions for third and fourth extensions of time, until December 4, 2017, to file the opening brief. Because appellant failed to submit the brief for filing by that date, the motions are denied. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.17-42768
01/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Due: 5 days.18-00989
01/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Brian Vasek in place of Amy Feliciano as counsel for Appellant).18-03318
01/24/2018MotionFiled Appellant Lipsitz's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.18-03319
02/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 19, 2018.18-04389
03/20/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.18-10804
03/20/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File the Appendix.18-10805
04/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the opening brief received on March 20, 2018, and the appendix received on March 26, 2018. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief.18-12547
04/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-12548
04/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.18-12549
05/02/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).18-16626
05/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 2, 2018.18-17787
07/02/2018MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief - Second Request.18-24931
07/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 23, 2018.18-26678
07/23/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-28179
08/21/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 5, 2018.18-32567
09/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-34748
09/06/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-00592
02/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-05716
02/14/2019MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Appellant. (SC)19-07174
02/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Vacating Oral Argument. Appellant's counsel has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The motion is granted. If appellant retains new counsel, counsel shall file a notice of appearance with this court forthwith. As this matter concerns an appeal from a judgment of conviction, appellant is reminded that he may not proceed in this appeal without counsel. The oral argument currently scheduled in this matter for February 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. (SC).19-07355
03/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-13778
04/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand to Secure Appellate Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. (SC)19-15920
04/26/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on April 26, 2019 appointing Terrence M. Jackson as counsel for appellant. (SC)19-18498
05/07/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefs. (SC)19-20019
05/08/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefs. (SC)19-20142
05/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's recently appointed counsel has filed a motion for leave to file supplemental briefs. The motion is denied. (SC).19-23443
05/30/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reset a Date for Oral Argument. (SC)19-23517
06/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's recently appointed counsel has filed a motion to reset a date for oral argument. The motion is denied. (SC),19-24241
06/06/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part, and Remanded with Instructions." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. SNP19-JH/LS/AS19-24490
06/13/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-25744
06/13/2019Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived
06/25/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)19-27363