Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72102
Short Caption:ANDERSON (ARNOLD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73351, 74076, 74736
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/11/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-00996
01/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).17-01827
01/30/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA)17-03242
02/06/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Counsel and Be Appointed Proper Person.17-04166
02/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice to Expedite Writ.17-05024
02/21/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[In light of this order, we take no action on the pro se motions filed on February 6 and 13, 2017. NNP17-RP/JH/LS.17-05885
03/20/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-09174
03/20/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 28, 2017.17-09174