Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72123
Short Caption:BALODIMAS, M.D. VS. DIST. CT. (REPUBLIC SILVER STATE DISPOSAL, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77867, 78572
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A738123Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/11/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:10/11/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from John H. Cotton.
01/13/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-01424
01/13/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.17-01425
01/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Appendix to Petition for Writ).17-01481
01/19/2017MotionFiled Petitioner Las Vegas Radiology, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company's Motion for Leave to Join James D. Balodimas, M.D. and James D. Balodimas, M.D., P.C.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-02094
01/27/2017MotionFiled Bruce D. Katuna, MD and Rocky Mountain Neurodiagnostics, LLC's Motion for Leave to Join James D. Balodimas, M.D. and James D. Balodimas, M.C., P.C.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-03112
02/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to remove Las Vegas Radiology, LLC; Bruce A. Katuna, M.D.; and Rocky Mountain Neurodiagnostics, LLC as real parties in interest and to include them as petitioners.17-03773
02/02/2017MotionFiled Petitioners, Andrew M. Cash, M.D.; Andrew M. Cash, M.D., P.C. aka Andrew Miller Cash, M.D., P.C.; & Desert Institute of Spine Care, LLC's Motion for Leave to Join Balodimas' Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-03921
02/09/2017Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 39750 returned to Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen, McKenna & Peabody..
03/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to remove Andrew M. Cash, M.D.; Andrew M. Cash, M.D., P.C. a.k.a Andrew Miller Cash, M.D., P.C.; and Desert Institute of Spine Care, LLC, as real parties in interest and include them as petitioners.17-07946
03/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of last-filed answer or notification to file and serve any replies.17-08906
04/07/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Republic Silver State Disposal's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Joinders Thereto.17-11612
04/07/2017AppendixFiled Appendix of Real Party in Interest/Respondent Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc. Vol. I.17-11613
04/11/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Republic Silver State Disposal's Erratum to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Joinders Thereto.17-11889
04/24/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Response to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition (Reply to Answer to Petition).17-13522
04/25/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Las Vegas Radiology, LLC's Joinder to Petitioner's Balodimas' Response to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition.17-13730
04/28/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioners Andrew Cash, MD; Andrew Cash, MD, PC & Desert Institute of Spine Care, LLC's Joinder to Petitioner Balodimas' Response to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition.17-14132
05/03/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Vruce A. Katuna, M.D. and Rocky Mountain Neurodiagnostics, LLC's Joinder to James D. Balodimas, M.D. Reply to Republic Silver State's Disposal's Answer to Writ.17-14575
05/03/2017AppendixFiled Bruce A. Katuna, M.D. and Rocky Mountain Neurodiagnostics, LLC's Appendix to Joinder.17-14576
05/03/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Las Vegas Radiology, LLC's Joinder to Bruce A. Katuna, M.D. and Rocky Mountain Neurodiagnostics, LLC's Joinder to James D. Balodimas, M.D. and James D. Balodimas, M.D., P.C.'s Reply to Republic Silver State Disposal's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and to Appendix Thereto.17-14792
05/11/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e) (Action is Necessary By May 22, 2017).17-15839
05/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. Having considered the unopposed motion, we grant the stay. Accordingly, the proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-16-738123-C are stayed pending further order of this court.17-18051
07/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-24462
09/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, October 11, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-29716
09/27/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-32767
10/11/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. MD/MG/KP.
12/22/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition and Dissolving Stay. ORDER the petition DENIED and dissolve the May 31, 2017 stay order. SNP17-MD/MG/KP.17-44274
01/17/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-02238
01/17/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.