Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72144
Short Caption:PATIN VS. LEECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69928
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A723134Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/18/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
01/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-01815
01/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-01817
01/25/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Brian D Nettles, Inc. Check No. 19241.
01/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-02857
01/26/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:17-02908
01/30/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-03233
01/30/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-03247
04/27/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Regarding Jurisdiction In Docket No. 69928 and Dismissing Appeal In Docket No. 72144. We conclude that that the appeal in Docket No. 69928 is limited to the issues related to the February 4, 2016, order denying the original special motion to dismiss. Regarding Docket No. 72144, we agree that the amended notice of appeal was untimely filed. Notice of entry of the order denying the renewed motion to dismiss was served electronically on September 29, 2016. Appellants did not file the amended notice of appeal until January 5, 2017, long after expiration of the 30-day appeal period. Thus, we lack jurisdiction, and we order the appeal in Docket No. 72144 dismissed. Nos. 69928/72144. NNP17-JH/RP/LS.17-14085
05/22/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-17111
05/22/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2017.17-17111