Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72274
Short Caption:PUB. EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYS. OF NEVADA VS. NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INST., INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 16OC001611BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/10/2017 / Chubb, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/07/2018 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/07/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/02/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
02/02/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-03884
02/02/2017Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 99979 returned to McDonald Carano Wilson.
02/02/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-03886
02/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.17-04055
02/10/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb.17-04872
02/15/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries17-05369
02/23/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-06254
02/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service re: Docketing Statement.17-06255
02/24/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Docketing Statement.17-06445
02/24/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 24, 2017 at 2:00 pm.17-06581
02/28/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-06871
03/07/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-07652
03/07/2017Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement.17-07713
03/27/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-10188
03/28/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-10386
04/12/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/17/17. To Court Reporter: Gail Wilsey.17-12151
04/17/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-12710
05/08/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/17/17.17-15241
05/16/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-16439
06/08/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 10, 2017.17-19009
07/11/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Brief is not double-spaced. NRAP 32(a)(4)).17-22851
07/11/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 1-4.17-22852
07/11/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-23032
08/10/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-26822
09/05/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: September 25, 2017.17-29643
09/26/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-32571
09/26/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Change of Address (Joseph F. Becker).17-42252
12/27/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-44548
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-02819
02/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-06437
03/07/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/18/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. Stiglich, J., with whom Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ., agree, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. EN BANC18-40944
11/06/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y18-903063
11/06/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Adam D. Hosmer-Henner. (SC)