Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72325
Short Caption:BELCHER, JR. (NORMAN) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-DIRECT)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64588
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C270562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/01/2019 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/01/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/08/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/08/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-04616
02/28/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-22 (Via FTP).17-06904
03/01/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 23-44 (Via FTP).17-06927
03/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 198-213, 322-344, 1378-1418, 1626-1653, 1913-1936, 2646-2649, 9471-9914 (SEALED).
03/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 6414-6424 (SEALED).
05/02/2017MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Expedited Consideration Requested.17-14559
05/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding for the Appointment of Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove Mark B. Bailus as counsel of record for appellant. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appellant. Written or Minute Order or Counsel's Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. Briefing Suspended.17-15483
05/17/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Christopher Oram as Counsel for the Appellant).17-16560
05/19/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/17/17. Order Appointing Christopher Oram as counsel for the Appellant (Response to Supreme Court Order dated 05/09/2017 - C270562).17-16859
05/24/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding for Appointment of Counsel.17-17329
05/26/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall add attorney Christopher Oram as counsel for appellant. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.17-17766
09/25/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of time to file Opening Brief.17-32410
10/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief & Appendix due: December 26, 2017.17-34369
12/27/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of time to File Opening Brief.17-44532
01/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: February 28, 2018.18-00427
02/28/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-07840
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Opening Brief due: 11 days.18-09188
03/19/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-10619
05/18/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).18-19188
05/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 17, 2018.18-20539
07/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time-Second Request (Answering Brief).18-27232
08/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a motion requesting a second 60-day extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is denied. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief.18-29594
08/17/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-32005
09/25/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 19.18-37361
10/03/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Untimely Motion for the Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.18-38710
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 30, 2018.18-39867
12/03/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-906605
12/03/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC)
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
02/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 1, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. for 60 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-08870
03/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-12183
04/01/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court (SC).