Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0522
Short Caption:IN RE: COMMITTEE UPDATE AND REVISE NRCPCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:02/10/2017Public Hearing:10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Establishing Committee. The Supreme Court has determined that the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure and the associated district court and specialized rules should be reviewed and updated as appropriate. This court concludes that a committee should be appointed to consider these matters and to make such recommendations to this court as the committee deems appropriate.17-04815
03/13/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Committee Member. Racheal Mastel is appointed to the Committee to update and revise the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.17-08320
05/04/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Committee Members. Kevin C. Powers and Todd E. Reese are appointed to the Committee to update and revise the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.17-14892
06/27/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Committee Member. William E. Peterson is appointed to the Committee to update and revise the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.17-21317
05/31/2018Administrative CaseFiled Presentation by the Nevada Certified Court Reporters Board to the State of Nevada Supreme Court Rules Committee.18-20650
08/15/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Committee Member. Loren S. Young is appointed to the Committee to update and revise the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.18-31548
08/15/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Committee Member. Honorable James E. Wilson is appointed to the Committee to update and revise the Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.18-31549
08/17/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (Exhibits attached.)Y18-31981
08/17/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Friday, October 19, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to the Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on October 12, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than October 12, 2018.18-32000
10/01/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Alexander M Falconi, Our Nevada Judges.18-38321
10/02/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from State of Nevada, Board of Psychological Examiners.18-38602
10/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Sharon Jones-Forrester, PhD with Center for Applied Neuroscience.18-39627
10/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Teri F Belmont PhD.18-39629
10/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lewis M Etcoff PhD.18-39630
10/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Gary R Silverman with Silverman Kattelman Springgate Chtd. (via-fax)18-39631
10/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Thomas F Kimsora PhD with Center for Applied Neuroscience.18-39633
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Gary R Silverman with Silverman Kattelman Springgate Chtd. (via-original)18-39999
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nevada Psychological Association.18-40001
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert A Leark, PhD with Forensic Neuropsychology & Psychology.18-40002
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Martha B Mahaffey, PhD.18-40004
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kimberly Farmer with the State Bar of Nevada.18-40005
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Karen M Kampfer, PhD.18-40021
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Litigation Section of the State Bar of Nevada.18-40109
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rick D Roskelley and Montgomery Y Paek with Littler Mendelson, PC. (via-e-mail)18-40155
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Laura L Jensen, PhD.18-40156
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.18-40198
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jorge A Ramirez with Wilson Elser.18-40224
10/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Thomas P Beko with Erickson Thorpe & Swainston, Ltd.18-40225
10/15/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Las Vegas Defense Lawyers.18-40308
10/16/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Justice Hardesty.18-40512
10/17/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Cliff W Marcek.18-40735
10/17/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rick D Roskelly and Montgomery T Paek weith Little Medelson, PC. (via-original)18-40816
10/18/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Douglas Cohen of Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP.18-40979
10/19/2018Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.
10/29/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments with attachment from Peter Hellman.18-42318
11/05/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lewis M Etcoff PhD.18-902709