Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72443
Short Caption:DOLORFINO VS. UNIV. MED. CTR. OF S. NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A735063Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/09/2017 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/14/2018 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/14/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
02/24/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-06469
02/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-06471
03/06/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Terry Law Group PC. Check No. 1770.
03/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-07568
03/09/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.17-08006
03/30/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-10654
05/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 4, 2017 at 9:00 am.17-17108
05/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Based upon the review of documents and discussions, holding a settlement conference would be futile. It is therefore cancelled and this matter should proceed through the appellate process17-17114
05/24/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-17360
07/14/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-23559
07/24/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.17-24479
08/23/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 5, 2017.17-28273
09/06/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.17-29827
09/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days.17-29829
09/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.17-30838
09/13/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-30839
10/06/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: October 30, 2017.17-34062
10/12/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Robert Harper Odell, Jr.'s Answering Brief due: October 30, 2017. fn1[The order granting telephonic extension, filed on October 6, 2017, was pursuant to a request made on behalf of respondent University Medical Center of Southern Nevada.]17-34909
10/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief from Respondent Robert Harper Odell, Jr. due: 5 days.17-37172
10/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief from Respondent University Medical Center of Southern Nevada due: 5 days.17-37179
10/30/2017BriefFiled Respondent University Medical Center of Southern Nevada's Answering Brief17-37182
10/31/2017BriefFiled Respondent Dr. Robert Odell, Jr.'s Answering Brief.17-37279
12/18/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief.
02/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Law Firm name change Morris, Sullivan, Lemkul & Pitegoff to Pitegoff Law Office).18-05586
03/29/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-12033
05/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, June 14, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-16582
05/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-20457
06/14/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. MC/RP/LS
10/04/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 79. SNP18-MC/RP/LS18-38877
10/23/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent Dr. Robert Odell, Jr.'s Petition for Rehearing.Y18-41554
10/23/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid on rehearing. E-Payment $150.00 from John H. Cotton.