Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72456
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (OJEDA (FRANCISCO))Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR150829Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/03/2018 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/03/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/28/2017Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/28/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.17-06727
02/28/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.17-06731
02/28/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service (Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus and Appendix to Petition for Writ).17-06910
04/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 20 days.17-12303
05/02/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. John Reese Petty, Chief Deputy Washoe County Public Defender appearing as counsel for Real Party in Interest Francisco Marino Ojeda.17-14462
05/03/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer Against Issuance of Writ.17-14583
05/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answer to Writ Petition due: June 2, 2017.17-15235
06/02/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer Against Issuance of Requested Writ.17-18419
06/02/2017AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix.17-18420
09/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-30755
11/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 3, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City.17-39788
12/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-43834
01/02/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Jennifer Noble, Appellate Deputy Attorney will participate in the oral argument of this case, in lieu of Joseph Plater.18-00006
01/03/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court.
12/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 94. EN BANC (SC)18-907299