Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72462
Short Caption:FLORES VS. LAS VEGAS-CLARK CTY. LIBRARY DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A735496Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/28/2017 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/05/2018 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/28/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
02/28/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-06823
02/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-06826
02/28/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.17-06908
03/03/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ashcraft & Barr LLP. Check No. 8048.
03/07/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-07675
03/07/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).17-07677
03/08/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge).17-07897
03/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Respondent (Dennis Kennedy and Kelly Stout as counsel for the Respondent).17-08085
04/03/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 17, 2017, at 9:00 am.17-11013
06/01/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-18259
06/06/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-18780
06/21/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-20487
09/01/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address.17-29504
09/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-29505
09/01/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service. (Opening Brief)17-29506
09/01/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.17-29509
09/21/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing.17-31938
09/26/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: November 1, 2017. Reply Brief due: 60 days from service of answering brief. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extraordinary circumstances and extreme need.17-32535
10/19/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing (Second Request).17-35901
11/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 15, 2017.17-39018
12/13/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing (Third Request).17-43037
12/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 16, 2018. Reply Brief due: 60 days thereafter.17-43893
01/17/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-02189
03/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-10718
03/20/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-23435
07/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 5, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-27248
07/19/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Dennis Kennedy to Argue on Behalf of Respondent).18-27550
08/21/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.18-32287
08/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. Lee I. Iglody of Iglody Law PLLC appearing on behalf of Michelle Flores at oral argument scheduled for September 5, 2018, at 11:30 a.m.18-32447
08/22/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.18-32600
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-32680
09/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/13/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty. Stiglich, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 101. EN BANC (SC)18-908482
01/07/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-00825
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)