Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72613
Short Caption:HAGER (IAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161457Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/14/2018 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/14/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/17/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-09058
03/21/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeal.17-09383
04/26/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Court Reporter Evelyn Stubbs Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: May 10, 2017.17-13925
05/11/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Evelyn Stubbs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/12/16, 12/14/16.17-15832
07/17/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to file Opening Brief.17-23658
07/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 16, 2017.17-23660
08/16/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-27445
08/16/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume One.17-27446
08/16/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Two.17-27447
08/16/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Three.17-27449
08/16/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Four.17-27450
08/16/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Five.17-27451
09/13/2017MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.17-30859
09/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: October 16, 2017.17-30890
10/12/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-34804
11/08/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-38442
11/08/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar18-07325
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 14, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-07738
04/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-16219
05/14/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel KP/MG/JH.
10/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefs. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the type-volume limitations in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). Appellant's brief is due 15 days from the date of this order, with respondent's brief to follow 15 days from service of the appellant's brief. No reply shall be filed.18-38930
10/12/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief.18-40100
10/12/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 1.18-40106
10/29/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Supplemental Brief).18-42435
10/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Supplemental Brief due: November 5, 2018.18-42461
11/06/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (SC)18-903016
08/29/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded."Before Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 34. NNP18-MG/KP/JH (SC)19-36157
09/16/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-38661
09/20/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-39289
10/04/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y19-41189